20 Easy Maths Tricks for Kids to Boost Calculation Skills
Ask children what subject they dislike the most in school, and a majority of them will probably say ‘math.’ Many kids find it difficult to grasp the core principles of maths, which makes the subject boring for them, and they simply refuse to put in the effort. In such cases, making the subject interesting and easy for kids will help them naturally enjoy the subject rather than it being forced on them. These math-related tricks for kids can help them understand those techniques, boost their calculation skills, and even surprise a few people with their seemingly magical abilities.
Simple Maths Tricks for Children
These simple math magic tricks for kids will build their interest in maths.
1. Calculating the Square of any Number that Ends with the Digit 5
Calculation of squares is a tough task. But for the set of numbers that end with 5, this can be quite easier than before. Two-digit numbers can be calculated instantly, while numbers with more than two digits might require you to know more tables.
- Let’s take the number 95 and attempt to find its square.
- As per the trick, start by writing the last two digits of the answer, which is 25 (the last two digits of the square of any number that ends with a 5 is 25).
- Now, the first digit in 95 is 9. The number that follows 9 is 10.
- Multiply 9 and 10 to get the answer, which is 90.
- Write 90 in the prefix of the 25 we already wrote as the answer. This makes the complete solution is 9025.
2. Easily Finding the Answer to any Number Multiplied by 11
Most children do end up memorising the multiplication tables up to 10. But this can be taken one step further by knowing how to multiply with 11 as well quickly.
- Let’s try multiplying 45 with 11.
- Separate the digits, 4 and 5 with a space between them, such as 4 [ ] 5.
- Now, carry out the addition of the two digits in the centre, such as 4 [4+5 = 9] 5.
- That’s your answer. 45 x 11 = 495.
- If the sum happens to be a two-digit number, such as with 56, which yields 5  6, simply add the tens place of the sum with the first digit.
- This would then be [5+1 = 6]  6, making the answer as 616.
3. Multiplying any Number Quickly by 9
In more multiplication tricks, multiplying any number by 9 can be even faster.
- Take a large number such as 754.
- To multiply this with 9, simply add a 0 at the end and subtract the original number.
- That makes it 7540 – 754 = 6786. That’s how quick it is!
4. Speed Multiplication Even when Doing it with 15
It might be easier with single digits. But what if you could multiply just as fast with 15 as well? Here’s how.
- Let’s try multiplying 79 with 15.
- Add a zero to the end of the number, making it 790.
- Divide it by 2. This gives us 790 / 2 = 395.
- Add those two numbers, which would be 395 + 790 = 1185.
- Verify it with the calculator, too.
5. Adding 2-Digit Numbers at Lightning Speed
By understanding the basic principles of tens and units places, you can add 2-digit numbers literally in a snap.
- Take 57 + 79.
- Split the second number into tens and units, making it 79 = 70 + 9.
- Finish up the tens addition, which is 57 + 70 = 137.
- Now add the remaining units place digit, which is 137 + 9 = 146. That’s it, you’re done.
6. The Answer for Anything Would be 37
A cool math trick that gives the answer 37 every time.
- Choose a 3 digit number with same digits. Let’s go with 333.
- Add the digits together. So, 3 + 3 + 3 = 9.
- Divide the original number with this sum. So, 333 / 9 = 37.
This trick works every single time.
7. Be it Large or Small, You will Always Reach Eight
A step up from the previous one, this works on choosing any number at all.
Let’s choose the number 53.
- Subtract 1 from it, so 53 – 1 = 52.
- Multiply by 3, so 52 x 3 = 156.
- Add 12 to it. So, 156 + 12 = 168.
- Divide this by 3. So, 168 / 3 = 56.
- Add 5 to this answer and subtract the original number. So, 56 + 5 – 53 = 8.
8. Multiply Quickly by Breaking Down Numbers
Multiplication is nothing but a combination of multiple additions.
- Lets try 14 x 12.
- So, 14 = (2 x 7), which makes the problem as 2 x 7 x 12.
- 7 x 12 = 84. Now 84 x 2 = 84 + 84 = 168. Quick answer is here.
9. Making a 5-Digit Number Repeat in Succession
This is an interesting trick for your kid that uses a calculator. Multiplying any 5 digit number with 11 and 9091 will yield an answer that repeats in succession.
- Let’s choose the number 12345.
- Multiplying it by 11 will give us the answer as 12345 x 11 = 135795.
- Now, take this answer and multiply it with 9091 to get the answer 135795 x 9091 = 1234512345.
- This answer is literally the number 12345 repeated twice.
10. No Matter What you do, The Answer will be the Same
This is the magic of the number 1089. By making use of specific calculations, no matter what 3-digit number is chosen, the answer will always turn out to be 1089. Here’s how.
- Let’s choose the number 537.
- Now the digits need to be rearranged in descending order, 753. This is your first number.
- Rearrange the same digits in the ascending order, 357. This is your second number.
- Subtract the second from the first, which will give us the answer, 753 – 357 = 396.
- Now reverse the order of digits of the answer to getting the number, 693.
- Let’s add both numbers, 396 + 693 = 1089, which we already knew.
11. Ensuring that Specific Digits will Always be Present
You can surprise your friends with your mental skills by telling them to follow some calculations, while you will tell them that the answer will only contain the digits 1,2,4,5,7 and 8 in any order.
- Start by choosing any number between 1 and 6. Let’s take 3.
- Multiply it by 9:- 3 x 9 = 27
- Multiply the answer by 111:- 27 x 111 = 2997
- Multiply that answer with 1001:- 2997 x 1001 = 29,99,997
- Divide this answer by 7:- 2999997/7 = 428571
12. Bringing you Back to Square One
This is a magic trick that can start from two digits and bring you back to them through an entire series of calculations.
- Let’s choose the two digits as 2 and 7.
- Pick one of those and multiply by 2. So, let’s choose 2. That makes 2 x 2 = 4.
- Add 5 to the answer. So, 4 + 5 = 9.
- Multiply that answer by 5. So, 9 x 5 = 45.
- Now, add the other digit you had chosen to this answer. So, 45 + 7 = 52.
- Subtract 4 from that answer. So, 52 – 4 = 48.
- Subtract 21 from the final answer. So, 48 – 21 = 27. These were the original digits, to begin with.
13. You Will Always Return to the Phenomenal Fifteen
Yet another trick that makes you return to the number fifteen no matter what number you choose.
- Let’s pick a number such as 279.
- Multiply it by 3. So, 279 x 3 = 837.
- Now add 45 to the answer. So, 837 + 45 = 882.
- Multiply that answer by 2. So, 882 x 2 = 1764.
- Divide this answer by 6. This will give you 1764 / 6 = 294.
- Subtract your original number from this answer.
- That makes it 294 – 279 = 15. Surprising, right?
14. The Final Destination is Always 6174
The number, 6174, is termed as having magical properties. If you keep subtracting a 4-digit number in a specific way, you will always reach 6174. This trick is also called Kaprekar’s operation.
- Let’s choose the number 1084.
- Ensure the digits are not the same.
- Every number we reach, the goal is to rearrange the digits to form the highest possible number and the lowest possible number and subtract the two.
- So, the largest number is 8410, and the lowest is 0148.
- The subtraction yields 8410 – 0148 = 8262.
- Largest with this is 8622, and lowest is 2268. Subtraction, 8622 – 2268 = 6354.
- Largest is 6543, and lowest is 3456. Subtraction, 6543 – 3456 = 3087.
- Followed by 8730 – 0378 = 8352.
- Finally, 8532 – 2358 = 6174. We’re here.
15. Guess the Age as well as the Change
A fantastic math trick can surprise your friend in guessing his age as well as the change he has in his pocket.
- Let’s assume your friend is 8 years old and he has two 5 rupee coins and four 2 rupee coins, bringing his total change to 18 rupees.
- Ask your friend to multiply his age by 2. So, 8 x 2 = 16.
- Add five to the answer. So, 16 + 5 = 21.
- Multiply this answer by 50. So, 21 x 50 = 1050.
- Subtract 365 from that answer. So, 1050 – 365 = 685.
- Ask your friend to add the total value of the change to this answer. So, 685 + 18 = 703.
- Add 115 to this answer. So, 703 + 115 = 818.
Look at this answer. The last two digits are the amount of change he has, and the first digit is his age.
16. Subtracting 3 digit numbers from 1000.
This one is a basic trick to subtract any 3-digit number from 1000.
- Choose a 3-digit number. Let’s take 496.
- Subtract the first digit from 9. So, 9 – 4 = 5
- Subtract the second digit from 9. So, 9 – 9 = 0
- Subtract the third digit from 10. So, 10 – 6 = 4
- The answer of 1000 – 496 = 504
17. Calendar Math
This is a fabulous trick to play with your children and maybe teach them too so that they can demonstrate it in front of their friends. Start by saying you can add any 9 numbers selected by others in a matter of seconds.
- Take a calendar and have someone choose a group of nine number in a 3×3 rectangle, and circle them.
- Choose the number in the centre and multiply it by nine.
- This will give you the exact sum of all the nine numbers.
18. Easy Divisibility Rules
Teach your child these divisibility rules and watch them divide numbers like a pro.
A number is
- Divisible by two if the last digit of the number is a multiple of 2.
- Divisible by 3 if the sum of all the digits is divisible by 3.
- Divisible by 4 if the last two digits of the number are divisible by 4.
- Divisible by 5 if the last digit of the number is 0 or 5.
- Divisible by 6 if the number is even and divisible by both 2 and 3.
- Divisible by 9 if the sum of all the digits is divisible by 9.
- Divisible by 10 if the number ends with a 0.
- Divisible by 12 if the sum of all digits is divisible by 3 and the number formed by the last two digits is divisible by 4.
19. The Pi Value
Most people memorise the value of pi till the 3.14 mark, but it is actually 3.141592. This quick trick will help them memorise it in no time.
- First, write down the sentence – “How I Wish I Could Calculate Pi.”
- Now, count the letters in each word and add the value against it. (HOW = 3, I = 1, Wish = 4, I = 1, Could = 5, Calculate = 9, Pi = 2)
- Write down the numbers and add a decimal after 3. This is the value of Pi (3.141592).
20. Comparing Fractions In Seconds
Without the same denominator, comparing fractions gets quite challenging. The following trick comes in handy during these times.
- Let’s take two fractions with different denominators (eg. 4/5 and 6/7).
- To compare which is greater, multiply the numerator of the first fraction with the denominator of the second fraction (eg. 4 X 7 = 28).
- Now, multiply the second fraction numerator with the denominator of the first fraction (6 X 5 = 30)
- As 30 is greater than 28, 6/7 is greater than 4/5.
Put an end to your child’s math-related misery with these easy-to-understand mathematics tricks and make him fall in love with the subject. These tricks can boost your child’s calculation skills and help him comprehend those hard-to-grasp concepts.
Benefits Of Teaching Maths To Kids Using Tricks
Once your child has the basic concepts of maths nailed down, it automatically gets rid of the anxiety behind the subject. Here’s why making math fun through tricks will help your child.
1. Creates a Love For The Subject
Let’s face it, any child will choose to spend his time doing something he loves. By using tricks to teach maths to your child, he will naturally develop a love for the subject and choose to delve deeper into it.
2. Boosting Confidence
Children often feel left behind in class as their peers and teachers move on to new topics , while they seem to be struggling with the previous one. This causes more fear behind the subject. Instead, if your child is able to grasp and learn concepts through tricks, he will be more confident in class.
3. Enhances Problem-Solving Skills
Maths tricks allow children to think outside the box and get creative with the subject. In turn, this helps them uniquely understand mathematical concepts and apply them in the future.
4. Improves Memory
Remembering the sequence of math tricks in order to apply them, takes a mix of memorising and problem solving. Kids will have to memorise certain rules and basic concepts to apply them to bigger problems in the later years of studying.
5. Reaches Kids at All Levels
No matter how old or how left behind a child is, math tricks break down concepts and make them easier to apply. Hence, they can be understood at all learning levels.
6. Promotes Mental Maths
Mental math ability is probably the most common form of math that we encounter on a daily basis. Math tricks make it easier for kids to add, subtract, divide and multiply on the fly.
1. Which Math Tricks Should My Child Need To Learn First?
The tricks your child should learn depends on his understanding of mathematical concepts. Begin with the basic rules of addition and subtraction, then multiplication, and then division. One your child has grasped the division concept, he can move on to fractions and others.
2. Does Math Improve Critical Thinking In My Child?
To complete a math problem, a child needs to evaluate and analyse it before he begins to solve it. Critical thinking comes into play here, as kids would need to make decisions and do the right calculations to achieve the correct result.
Apart from maths skills, it’s important for kids to have an all-round development, with other life-skills as well. For this, a monthly subscription box like Intellikit can hone your child’s talents with fun activities involving various types of play. Based on a unique theme each month, each box combines fun with learning, keeping your child occupied all month long. Subscribe now!
Mental maths tricks for kids are used in multiple areas of science and technology. These tricks come in handy even in competitions. Nonetheless, your child will definitely benefit from these math tricks because he can use them daily at school.